TN SB1066 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for certain distribution or transfer criminal offenses involving fentanyl, or an equipotent amount of carfentanil, sufentanil, or the analogues of fentanyl to Class B felony if amount between 0.1 and 10 grams and to Class A felony if amount more than 10 grams. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, increases the penalty for certain distribution or transfer criminal offenses involving fentanyl, or an equipotent amount of carfentanil, sufentanil, or the analogues of fentanyl to Class B felony if amount between 0.1 and 10 grams and to Class A felony if amount more than 10 grams. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0120 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary