TN HB0120 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for certain distribution or transfer criminal offenses involving fentanyl, or an equipotent amount of carfentanil, sufentanil, or the analogues of fentanyl to Class B felony if amount between 0.1 and 10 grams and to Class A felony if amount more than 10 grams. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, increases the penalty for certain distribution or transfer criminal offenses involving fentanyl, or an equipotent amount of carfentanil, sufentanil, or the analogues of fentanyl to Class B felony if amount between 0.1 and 10 grams and to Class A felony if amount more than 10 grams. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-28 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1066 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee