TN SB1028 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows a person who was convicted of a nonviolent offense committed prior to January 1, 1980, and received a pardon for the offense to have the person's criminal records related to the offense expunged. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 32, relative to expunction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 361
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-28SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-28SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-26HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2
2021-04-26HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-15SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021
2021-03-09SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0893 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 361

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback