TN HB0893 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows a person who was convicted of a nonviolent offense committed prior to January 1, 1980, and received a pardon for the offense to have the person's criminal records related to the offense expunged. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 32, relative to expunction.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 361
2021-04-26HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-07HouseAction def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/31/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
2021-02-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1028 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 361

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback