TN SB1015 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that it is the intent of the general assembly that the general law regarding weapons is preemptive with respect to the transfer, ownership, possession or transportation of knives and that no city, county, or metropolitan government may occupy any part of the field of regulation of the transfer, ownership, possession or transportation of knives. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, specifies that it is the intent of the general assembly that the general law regarding weapons is preemptive with respect to the transfer, ownership, possession or transportation of knives and that no city, county, or metropolitan government may occupy any part of the field of regulation of the transfer, ownership, possession or transportation of knives. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Vance Dennis [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Pub. Ch. 418 |
2013-05-22 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-23 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-18 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 2 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 18 |
2013-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0443) |
2013-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0186) |
2013-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 3 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0054) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/7/2013 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/7/2013 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/4/2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | S. Placed on cal. for 3/4/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0581 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418