TN HB0581 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that it is the intent of the general assembly that the general law regarding weapons is preemptive with respect to the transfer, ownership, possession or transportation of knives and that no city, county, or metropolitan government may occupy any part of the field of regulation of the transfer, ownership, possession or transportation of knives. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, specifies that it is the intent of the general assembly that the general law regarding weapons is preemptive with respect to the transfer, ownership, possession or transportation of knives and that no city, county, or metropolitan government may occupy any part of the field of regulation of the transfer, ownership, possession or transportation of knives. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Vance Dennis [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 418 |
2013-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-03-20 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1015 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 418