TN SB1000 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes pension stabilization reserve trusts for the hybrid and legacy retirement plans; makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 9 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, establishes pension stabilization reserve trusts for the hybrid and legacy retirement plans; makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 9 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374 | |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1373 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 374