TN HB1373 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 374
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes pension stabilization reserve trusts for the hybrid and legacy retirement plans; makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 9 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, establishes pension stabilization reserve trusts for the hybrid and legacy retirement plans; makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 9 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Pub. Ch. 374 | |
2017-05-22 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2017 | |
2017-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-03 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3 Ayes 89, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1373 |
2017-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0497) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0496) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0268) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0046) |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2017-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1000 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 374