TN SB0985 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, limits amount of fluoride that public water supply system operators may add to public drinking water; requires that fluoride testing results be open for public inspection; requires public notice of fluoridation. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, limits amount of fluoride that public water supply system operators may add to public drinking water; requires that fluoride testing results be open for public inspection; requires public notice of fluoridation. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2018-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/15/2018
2018-03-12SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. EA&NR Comm. 3-15-18
2017-03-20SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
2017-03-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0675 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Failed for lack of motion in: Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback