TN HB0675 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Failed for lack of motion in: Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Failed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Failed for lack of motion in: Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits amount of fluoride that public water supply system operators may add to public drinking water; requires that fluoride testing results be open for public inspection; requires public notice of fluoridation. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, limits amount of fluoride that public water supply system operators may add to public drinking water; requires that fluoride testing results be open for public inspection; requires public notice of fluoridation. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 221, Part 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Failed for lack of motion in: Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0985 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee