TN SB0984 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 371
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 371
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines a "biological product" and an "interchangeable biological product" in the Tennessee Affordable Drug Act of 2005; authorizes a prescriber to substitute a prescribed biological product for an interchangeable biological product if certain requirements are met. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10.
Title
As enacted, defines a "biological product" and an "interchangeable biological product" in the Tennessee Affordable Drug Act of 2005; authorizes a prescriber to substitute a prescribed biological product for an interchangeable biological product if certain requirements are met. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 6 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 371 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2015 | |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment 6 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-13 | House | H. adopted am. 6 |
2015-04-13 | House | Am. 5, withdrawn. |
2015-04-13 | House | Am. 4 reconsidered, withdrawn. |
2015-04-13 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2015-04-13 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA0108) |
2015-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0107) |
2015-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0106) |
2015-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0105) |
2015-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0119) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0149) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0118) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0572 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 371