TN SB0956 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of lifetime handgun permits to service disabled veterans who otherwise qualify for issuance of a permit, subject to providing documentation and payment of a $200 fee. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, authorizes issuance of lifetime handgun permits to service disabled veterans who otherwise qualify for issuance of a permit, subject to providing documentation and payment of a $200 fee. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0845 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Failed In s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee