TN SB0954 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates the Class C misdemeanor, punishable only by a fine of up to $50.00, for a person to knowingly operate a motor vehicle in any marked school zone in this state, when a warning flasher or flashers are in operation, and talk on a hand-held mobile telephone while the vehicle is in motion; makes it a delinquent act, punishable only by a fine of up to $50.00, for a person under the age of 18 to operate a motor vehicle and talk on a mobile phone that is equipped with a hands-free device while the vehicle is in motion; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates the Class C misdemeanor, punishable only by a fine of up to $50.00, for a person to knowingly operate a motor vehicle in any marked school zone in this state, when a warning flasher or flashers are in operation, and talk on a hand-held mobile telephone while the vehicle is in motion; makes it a delinquent act, punishable only by a fine of up to $50.00, for a person under the age of 18 to operate a motor vehicle and talk on a mobile phone that is equipped with a hands-free device while the vehicle is in motion; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Pub. Ch. 416
2017-05-23 Effective date(s) 01/01/2018
2017-05-18SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-05-11SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-05-09HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-05SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 68, Nays 11, PNV 1
2017-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0499)
2017-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-05-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-04-27SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-04-27SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-27SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 1
2017-04-27SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0446)
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/27/2017
2017-04-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1
2017-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/17/2017
2017-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2017
2017-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/20/2017
2017-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/27/2017
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/6/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0868 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 416

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback