TN SB0940 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from February 15 to February 1 the due date for persons engaged in mining, quarrying, production of minerals or gas, manufacture of gas or pig iron, and similar businesses to annually report output to the department of labor and workforce development. - Amends TCA Title 59; Title 67, Chapter 7; Section 68-105-120 and Title 69, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 59; Title 67, Chapter 7; Section 68-105-120 and Title 69, Chapter 3, relative to mining.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1435 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.