TN SB0922 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Action deferred to first calendar of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits an insurance policy that provides benefits for anti-cancer medications that are injected or intravenously administered by a healthcare provider and anti-cancer medications that are patient administered from requiring a higher copayment, deductible, or coinsurance amount for the patient administered anti-cancer medication than for the injected or intravenously administered anti-cancer medication. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits an insurance policy that provides benefits for anti-cancer medications that are injected or intravenously administered by a healthcare provider and anti-cancer medications that are patient administered from requiring a higher copayment, deductible, or coinsurance amount for the patient administered anti-cancer medication than for the injected or intravenously administered anti-cancer medication. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateAction deferred to first calendar of 2018
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-04-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017
2017-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1059 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback