TN HB1059 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits an insurance policy that provides benefits for anti-cancer medications that are injected or intravenously administered by a healthcare provider and anti-cancer medications that are patient administered from requiring a higher copayment, deductible, or coinsurance amount for the patient administered anti-cancer medication than for the injected or intravenously administered anti-cancer medication. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23.
Title
As introduced, prohibits an insurance policy that provides benefits for anti-cancer medications that are injected or intravenously administered by a healthcare provider and anti-cancer medications that are patient administered from requiring a higher copayment, deductible, or coinsurance amount for the patient administered anti-cancer medication than for the injected or intravenously administered anti-cancer medication. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 23.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - INSURANCE AND BANKING COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - INSURANCE AND BANKING SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0922 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-04 - Action deferred to first calendar of 2018