TN SB0919 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a court to sentence a person who was convicted of a nonviolent offense and is the primary caretaker of a dependent child to an individually assessed sentence based on community rehabilitation with a focus on parent-child unity and support. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires a court to sentence a person who was convicted of a nonviolent offense and is the primary caretaker of a dependent child to an individually assessed sentence based on community rehabilitation with a focus on parent-child unity and support. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0825 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee