TN SB0907 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Transportation Network Company Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56 and Title 65.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Transportation Network Company Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520 | |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0992 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 520