TN HB0992 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Transportation Network Company Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56 and Title 65.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Transportation Network Company Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 520 | |
2015-06-03 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2015 | |
2015-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 1 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA0326) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0325) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0324) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0261) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 6, PNV 0 |
2015-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0453) |
2015-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0445) |
2015-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0223) |
2015-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | House | Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0907 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520