TN SB0900 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "New Markets Development Act." - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56 and Title 67, relative to tax relief for new markets tax credit recipients.
Sponsors
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1218 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.