TN HB1218 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "New Markets Development Act." - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 56 and Title 67, relative to tax relief for new markets tax credit recipients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0900 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee