TN SB0899 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that in the event of a natural disaster or serious outbreak of illness affecting or endangering students or staff during a school year, the commissioner of education may waive for such school year the requirement for 180 days of classroom instruction, if the request is submitted to the commissioner by the director of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, provides that in the event of a natural disaster or serious outbreak of illness affecting or endangering students or staff during a school year, the commissioner of education may waive for such school year the requirement for 180 days of classroom instruction, if the request is submitted to the commissioner by the director of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-05 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 272 | |
2009-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/21/09 | |
2009-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-05-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-05-18 | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0398) | |
2009-05-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-05-18 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-05-14 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-14 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0447) | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/14/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0896 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272