TN HB0896 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that in the event of a natural disaster or serious outbreak of illness affecting or endangering students or staff during a school year, the commissioner of education may waive for such school year the requirement for 180 days of classroom instruction, if the request is submitted to the commissioner by the director of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, provides that in the event of a natural disaster or serious outbreak of illness affecting or endangering students or staff during a school year, the commissioner of education may waive for such school year the requirement for 180 days of classroom instruction, if the request is submitted to the commissioner by the director of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272 | |
2009-05-18 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/18/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/14/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in Education Committee to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-03-16 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0899 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 272
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0896&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0896.pdf |