TN SB0894 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates Class A misdemeanor of inserting a radio frequency identification device into an individual without the consent of the individual; prohibits certain persons and entities from requiring an individual to have a radio frequency identification device attached to, or implanted into, the individual in order to engage in employment with the persons or entities, or to enter a school or a school's grounds. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, creates Class A misdemeanor of inserting a radio frequency identification device into an individual without the consent of the individual; prohibits certain persons and entities from requiring an individual to have a radio frequency identification device attached to, or implanted into, the individual in order to engage in employment with the persons or entities, or to enter a school or a school's grounds. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1418 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary