TN SB0876 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates maintenance of effort requirements with respect to the BEP nonclassroom components for LEAs, in which the required local contribution, based on the local jurisdiction's ability to generate local revenues, is more than 50 percent of the total BEP state and local funding. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, eliminates maintenance of effort requirements with respect to the BEP nonclassroom components for LEAs, in which the required local contribution, based on the local jurisdiction's ability to generate local revenues, is more than 50 percent of the total BEP state and local funding. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0673 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0876&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0876.pdf |