TN SB0811 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the “Tennessee Right to Try Act.” - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the “Tennessee Right to Try Act.” - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376 | |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0143 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-12 - Pub. Ch. 376