TN SB0786 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends expiration date of reporting requirement to department of revenue by wholesalers of food, candy, or nonalcoholic beverages regarding net sales of such products to retailers from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2022; revises other provisions related to required reports. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-410.
Title
As enacted, extends expiration date of reporting requirement to department of revenue by wholesalers of food, candy, or nonalcoholic beverages regarding net sales of such products to retailers from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2022; revises other provisions related to required reports. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-410.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 179 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/23/2019 | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0233) |
2019-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0167) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0930 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 179