TN HB0930 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends expiration date of reporting requirement to department of revenue by wholesalers of food, candy, or nonalcoholic beverages regarding net sales of such products to retailers from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2022; revises other provisions related to required reports. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-410.
Title
As enacted, extends expiration date of reporting requirement to department of revenue by wholesalers of food, candy, or nonalcoholic beverages regarding net sales of such products to retailers from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2022; revises other provisions related to required reports. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-410.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 179 | |
2019-04-10 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0786 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 179