TN SB0742 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises various provisions regarding social security, including, among other things, the deletion of provisions regarding administrative costs paid by subdivisions; recovery of delinquencies and penalties and contracts assuring social security contributions; appropriations for contributions and administrative costs; payments to the treasury department; appropriation estimates; sick payments on account of illness or accident disability to an employee. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-2403 and Title 8, Chapter 38.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises various provisions regarding social security, including, among other things, the deletion of provisions regarding administrative costs paid by subdivisions; recovery of delinquencies and penalties and contracts assuring social security contributions; appropriations for contributions and administrative costs; payments to the treasury department; appropriation estimates; sick payments on account of illness or accident disability to an employee. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-2403 and Title 8, Chapter 38.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-19 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24SenateComp. became Pub. Ch. 170
2013-04-01SenateAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0181)
2013-04-01SenateComp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2013-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013
2013-03-19SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
2013-03-12SenateAction Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 3/19/2013
2013-03-06SenatePlaced on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
2013-02-06SenateP2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2013-02-04SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-31SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1035 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 170

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback