TN HB1035 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 170
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding social security, including, among other things, the deletion of provisions regarding administrative costs paid by subdivisions; recovery of delinquencies and penalties and contracts assuring social security contributions; appropriations for contributions and administrative costs; payments to the treasury department; appropriation estimates; sick payments on account of illness or accident disability to an employee. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-2403 and Title 8, Chapter 38.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding social security, including, among other things, the deletion of provisions regarding administrative costs paid by subdivisions; recovery of delinquencies and penalties and contracts assuring social security contributions; appropriations for contributions and administrative costs; payments to the treasury department; appropriation estimates; sick payments on account of illness or accident disability to an employee. - Amends TCA Section 4-3-2403 and Title 8, Chapter 38.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 170 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/16/2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2013-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-04-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2013-04-01 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0210) |
2013-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0742 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 170