TN SB0655 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 190
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes the Blue Alert system to provide rapid dissemination of information to aid in detection of persons when law enforcement officer is killed, injured or suspiciously missing in line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, establishes the Blue Alert system to provide rapid dissemination of information to aid in detection of persons when law enforcement officer is killed, injured or suspiciously missing in line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Beavers (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Beavers (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 190 | |
2011-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-04 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-03 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-04-28 | S. concurred in H. am. 2 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-25 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0182) | |
2011-04-25 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0135) | |
2011-04-25 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2011-04-14 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2011-04-11 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-04-11 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-11 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0191) | |
2011-04-08 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/11/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0724 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 190