TN SB0623 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state board of education to provide professional development credit to a teacher who successfully completes a foreign language course that will assist the teacher in educating students for whom English is a second language; allows a local board of education to grant teachers one day of in-service credit for successfully completing an approved foreign language course. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the state board of education to provide professional development credit to a teacher who successfully completes a foreign language course that will assist the teacher in educating students for whom English is a second language; allows a local board of education to grant teachers one day of in-service credit for successfully completing an approved foreign language course. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0561 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-07 - Withdrawn.