TN SB0620 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner to annually transmit a report to transportation and safety committee of the senate and transportation committee of the house of representatives, on or before February 15, showing a list of the 10 oldest on-going road and bridge projects and steps taken to complete them from previous year, including projected completion dates. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 54, relative to reporting of road and bridge projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0363 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee