TN SB0594 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, updates the definitions of "firearm" and "antique firearm" to mirror definitions under federal law; makes various changes related to updated definitions. - Amends TCA Section 39-11-106; Section 39-13-103 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, updates the definitions of "firearm" and "antique firearm" to mirror definitions under federal law; makes various changes related to updated definitions. - Amends TCA Section 39-11-106; Section 39-13-103 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-22SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0259)
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0259)
2019-04-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-07HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0712 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback