TN HB0712 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, updates the definitions of "firearm" and "antique firearm" to mirror definitions under federal law; makes various changes related to updated definitions. - Amends TCA Section 39-11-106; Section 39-13-103 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, updates the definitions of "firearm" and "antique firearm" to mirror definitions under federal law; makes various changes related to updated definitions. - Amends TCA Section 39-11-106; Section 39-13-103 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0594 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-22 - Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0259)

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback