TN SB0564 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the officers of a party to file with the secretary of state and with the coordinator of elections a copy of the rules under which the party and its subdivisions operate within 15 days, instead of 30 days, following adoption in order for the party to have nominees on a ballot or exercise other rights of a political party. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 17; Title 27; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Title 54; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2; Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 10; Title 17; Title 27; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Title 54; Title 57 and Title 67, relative to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0499 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee