TN SB0557 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Firearm Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38 and Title 39, relative to firearm laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/13/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 444 | |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 18, PNV 2 |
2021-04-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0312) |
2021-04-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 5 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0392) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0446 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 444