TN HB0446 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds a prohibition of the expenditure of state or local funds or employees to implement, regulate, or enforce any federal law or executive order regulating the sale of firearms, ammunition, or firearm accessories if the expenditure of funds or use of employees would violate a state law or the state constitution. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38 and Title 39, relative to firearm laws.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-26HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/21
2021-04-26HouseReset on cal. for 4/29/2021
2021-04-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0557 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback