TN SB0507 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the attorney general and reporter and state and local law enforcement agencies to pursue federal money to reimburse the state and local governments for moneys spent complying with federal immigration laws; requires the state to reimburse local entities if the federal reimbursement is not sufficient to cover moneys spent complying with federal immigration laws. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 7.
Title
As introduced, requires the attorney general and reporter and state and local law enforcement agencies to pursue federal money to reimburse the state and local governments for moneys spent complying with federal immigration laws; requires the state to reimburse local entities if the federal reimbursement is not sufficient to cover moneys spent complying with federal immigration laws. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0558 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee