TN HB0558 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the attorney general and reporter and state and local law enforcement agencies to pursue federal money to reimburse the state and local governments for moneys spent complying with federal immigration laws; requires the state to reimburse local entities if the federal reimbursement is not sufficient to cover moneys spent complying with federal immigration laws. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the attorney general and reporter and state and local law enforcement agencies to pursue federal money to reimburse the state and local governments for moneys spent complying with federal immigration laws; requires the state to reimburse local entities if the federal reimbursement is not sufficient to cover moneys spent complying with federal immigration laws. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0507 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback