TN SB0494 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes provisions governing marriage by proxy for persons in the armed forces. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, establishes provisions governing marriage by proxy for persons in the armed forces. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 397 | |
2017-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2017 | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0524) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0524) |
2017-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0243) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0463 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 397