TN HB0463 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes provisions governing marriage by proxy for persons in the armed forces. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, establishes provisions governing marriage by proxy for persons in the armed forces. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 397
2017-05-03HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-03HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-04-27HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017
2017-04-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/18/2017
2017-04-04HouseFailed for lack of second in: Civil Justice Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-28HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Civil Justice Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/21/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/14/2017
2017-03-07HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/14/2017
2017-03-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/7/2017
2017-03-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-06HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0494 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 397

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback