TN SB0442 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes LEAs that receive pre-kindergarten program approval to utilize a comparable alternative measure of student growth approved by the state board of education and adopted by the LEA, rather than the pre-k/kindergarten growth portfolio model approved by the state board of education in the evaluation of pre-kindergarten and kindergarten teachers; creates portfolio review committee. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes LEAs that receive pre-kindergarten program approval to utilize a comparable alternative measure of student growth approved by the state board of education and adopted by the LEA, rather than the pre-k/kindergarten growth portfolio model approved by the state board of education in the evaluation of pre-kindergarten and kindergarten teachers; creates portfolio review committee. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 376 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0399) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0399) |
2019-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0228) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0439) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0395) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0091 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376