TN HB0091 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes LEAs that receive pre-kindergarten program approval to utilize a comparable alternative measure of student growth approved by the state board of education and adopted by the LEA, rather than the pre-k/kindergarten growth portfolio model approved by the state board of education in the evaluation of pre-kindergarten and kindergarten teachers; creates portfolio review committee. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes LEAs that receive pre-kindergarten program approval to utilize a comparable alternative measure of student growth approved by the state board of education and adopted by the LEA, rather than the pre-k/kindergarten growth portfolio model approved by the state board of education in the evaluation of pre-kindergarten and kindergarten teachers; creates portfolio review committee. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. John Holsclaw [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] |
Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Bill Sanderson [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] |
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376 | |
2019-05-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Action def. in Education to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to Portfolio Calendar |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c House Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-01-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0442 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 376