TN SB0428 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, contingent upon availability of certain amount of surplus revenues, reduces sales tax rate on food by .5 percent in next fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, contingent upon availability of certain amount of surplus revenues, reduces sales tax rate on food by .5 percent in next fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub. Com. | |
2011-03-01 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0431 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0428&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0428.pdf |