TN HB0431 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, contingent upon availability of certain amount of surplus revenues, reduces sales tax rate on food by .5 percent in next fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, contingent upon availability of certain amount of surplus revenues, reduces sales tax rate on food by .5 percent in next fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0428 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub. Com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0431&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0431.pdf |