TN SB0419 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to gather certain data regarding asthma morbidity, causal factors, and services; assess patterns of medical care and population-based health services; develop and maintain measures to track and report asthma development and treatment rates; report to relevant legislative committees and on its website asthma development and treatment rates; and guide the development of public health programs and asthma policy. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to gather certain data regarding asthma morbidity, causal factors, and services; assess patterns of medical care and population-based health services; develop and maintain measures to track and report asthma development and treatment rates; report to relevant legislative committees and on its website asthma development and treatment rates; and guide the development of public health programs and asthma policy. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0380 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.