TN HB0380 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to gather certain data regarding asthma morbidity, causal factors, and services; assess patterns of medical care and population-based health services; develop and maintain measures to track and report asthma development and treatment rates; report to relevant legislative committees and on its website asthma development and treatment rates; and guide the development of public health programs and asthma policy. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the department to gather certain data regarding asthma morbidity, causal factors, and services; assess patterns of medical care and population-based health services; develop and maintain measures to track and report asthma development and treatment rates; report to relevant legislative committees and on its website asthma development and treatment rates; and guide the development of public health programs and asthma policy. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-06HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2019-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0419 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback