TN SB0398 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of human services to develop, implement, and manage a program to provide monthly stipends for certain state employees for the cost of child care services. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 8, Chapter 50 and Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 8, Chapter 50 and Title 71, Chapter 1, Part 1, relative to a program to assist state employees with child care costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0478 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-07 - Sponsor(s) Added.