TN SB0395 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permanently exempts from sales and use tax, the retail sale of gun safes and gun safety devices; removes the temporary sales tax holiday. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to taxation of gun safes and gun safety devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee with negative recommendation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/28/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0342 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee